U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SENIOR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Medical Treatment]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2016
  • January 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 29, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 21, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.