U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CARTWRIGHT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Judgment]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Order]
  • November 18, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 04, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 04, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
October, 2015
  • October 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.