U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:09-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2020
  • May 04, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 11, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 11, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.