U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WHIPPLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Judgment]
September, 2016
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
June, 2016
  • June 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2016
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 17, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
October, 2015
  • October 29, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.