U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:10-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Morris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 17, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2016
  • November 07, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
November, 2015
  • November 02, 2015: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.