U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:03-cr-00052-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Mahdi et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 22, 2024: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2021
  • April 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Motion in Arrest of Judgment]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Motion Rule 60(b) Relief from Judgment or Order]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • December 14, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 30, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • November 10, 2015: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.