U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:15-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COLLINS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 15, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2015
  • November 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.