U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CRUZ-MONTES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 24, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • November 24, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.