U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:12-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SMITH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order to Surrender]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Order]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2017
  • July 03, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 05, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2015
  • December 04, 2015: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.