U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:05-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COCHRAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • June 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.