U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RIGGINS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Joint Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order]
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 20, 2016: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.