U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TRENAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2017
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 20, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.