U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MUMFORD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2020: [Order]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order]
February, 2016
  • February 23, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.