U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:12-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MCNEAL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 12, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
September, 2016
  • September 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 25, 2016: [Order]
  • April 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.