U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:01-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MATTHEWS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
  • October 03, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 08, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 12, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.