U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MOORE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2017
  • May 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.