U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
  • July 10, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
March, 2016
  • March 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.