U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:06-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Whittaker et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.