U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:11-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. REESE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 28, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.