U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:01-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kirk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.