U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:05-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Winn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Order]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Order of Detention]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2016
  • December 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.