U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LARRY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 22, 2025: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 04, 2021: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2020
  • August 06, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Judgment]
August, 2017
  • August 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • February 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2016
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 01, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 16, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.