U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00038-6
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Ward et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.