U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALSOBROOKS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 06, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.