U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Judgment]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • July 19, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.