U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:08-cr-00007-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • June 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.