U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:10-cr-00058-3
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TODD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 17, 2020: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.