U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00018-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ATKINSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
  • June 09, 2020: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
August, 2016
  • August 10, 2016: [Judgment]
  • August 09, 2016: [Judgment]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
April, 2016
  • April 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.