U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 28, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.