U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JENKINS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
July, 2017
  • July 10, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Postpone]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 20, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 25, 2017: [Judgment]
  • May 19, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2017: [Judgment]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 12, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 05, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.