U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRIDGES et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 11, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Departure]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Judgment]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Order]
  • December 02, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Sealed Order]
  • November 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order]
  • September 07, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2016
  • April 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.