U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RUCKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • December 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 27, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.