U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CRUMITIE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 26, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • April 08, 2020: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 10, 2017: [Judgment]
December, 2016
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 12, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.