U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:95-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GRAVES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 28, 2016: [Order]
May, 2016
  • May 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.