U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BELCHER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2016
  • May 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.