U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AZUBUIKE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 19, 2019: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 18, 2017: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2016
  • October 03, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.