U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:16-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DENNARD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Amended Motion]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order of Detention]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 02, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
May, 2016
  • May 18, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.