U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CRICHTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • June 12, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 07, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.