U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HARRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
June, 2017
  • June 09, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 03, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.