U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:06-cr-00020-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • October 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.