U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:06-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
December, 2016
  • December 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.