U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. POWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2020
  • August 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2020: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2020
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 15, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 14, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Judgment]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • February 07, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 18, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 08, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.