U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MULLIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2016
  • September 20, 2016: [Order]
August, 2016
  • August 11, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.