U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:02-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.