U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:06-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Arnold
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 09, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2017
  • December 08, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 08, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.