U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:98-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Polk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 28, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.