U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:04-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. McCoy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.