U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BETHEA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
January, 2017
  • January 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.