U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:94-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Coleman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - FIRST STEP ACT]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to File Highly Sensitive Document]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 15, 2020: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 11, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.