U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:04-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • June 13, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
December, 2016
  • December 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2016
  • November 04, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.